Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Defendant: Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Case Number: 2:2020cv01429
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Fund re #2 Summons Issued. Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/10/2020. (Urban, Michael)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Urban, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
August 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6108171) by Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Journeyman and Apprentice Training Trust, Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Fund. Proof of service due by 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Urban, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Pension Trust et al v. Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seek N Find Inspection Testing & Training
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Operating Engineers Vacation-Holiday Savings Trust
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?