Morales v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Gustavo Morales, Jr
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01435
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to 13 Minute Order,,,,, by Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contact Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Laughter v Progressive, #3 Exhibit C Progressive v Fed Deposit Ins) (Holmes, Meredith)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/31/2021. Motions due by 4/30/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #14 . Attorney Meredith L. Holmes is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/9/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Progressive Direct Insurance Company and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Defendants state that they are Ohio corporations, but fail to specify their respective principal places of business. See Johnson v. Colombia Props. Anchorage, LP, 437 F.3d 894, 899 (9th Cir. 2006) ("[A] corporation is a citizen only of (1) the state where its principal place of business is located, and (2) the state in which it is incorporated."). Defendants shall have until September 18, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to address the jurisdictional issues implicated by this Order, Plaintiff shall have until September 18, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, discussing the concerns herein raised.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of 26(f) Case Conference by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT in Removal Action by Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #9 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix. Attorney Ryan Dennett is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Minute Order) (Dennett, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Gustavo Morales, Jr. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harris, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendants Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Dennett, Ryan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/25/2020.(Dennett, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Christian N. Griffin is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/3/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/18/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 3, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Progressive Direct Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dennett, Ryan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-817405-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6110050) by Progressive Direct Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Dennett, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Progressive Direct Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Represented By: Meredith L. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Represented By: Meredith L. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Morales, Jr
Represented By: Christian N Griffin
Represented By: Brian K Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?