Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v. Cegavske
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee, Nevada Republican Party and Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of Nevada and Barbara Cegavske
Intervenor Defendant: DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe, Nevada State Democratic Party and Walker River Paiute Tribe
Case Number: 2:2020cv01445
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 48 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #37 Motion to Dismiss and Denying as moot #10 , #40 Motions to Dismiss, #41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #43 Motion to Intervene. The clerk is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 17, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE to #40 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Williams, J)
September 15, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to #37 MOTION to Dismiss #29 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Barbara Cegavske. (Zunino, Gregory) Modified on 9/15/2020 to link to Motion (SLD).
September 14, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jacqueline De Leon; Samantha B. Kelty to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/28/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Walker River Paiute Tribe, Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer) (Williams, Wes)
September 8, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE to #37 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Replies due by 9/15/2020. (Williams, J)
September 4, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Responses due by 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler R. Green, #2 Exhibit 1 - NV Sec. of State 2012 General Election Turnout, #3 Exhibit 2 - NV Sec. of State 2014 General Election Turnout, #4 Exhibit 3 - NV Sec. of State 2016 General Election Turnout, #5 Exhibit 4 - NV Sec. of State 2018 General Election Turnout, #6 Exhibit 5 - Assembly Bill 4, NV Legisl., #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Emergency Directive 009, #8 Exhibit 7 - USPS Section 1-1.3 Postmarks, #9 Exhibit 8 - USPS Report No. 20-235, #10 Exhibit 9 - WSJ Article 8/7/20, #11 Exhibit 10 - Letter from Thomas Marshall, #12 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Jesse R. Law, #13 Exhibit 12 - USPS Article 3138 (1/26/20), #14 Exhibit 13 - LVRJ Article (8/14/20), #15 Exhibit 14 - Email from Joseph P. Gloria, #16 Exhibit 15 - LVRJ Article (5/19/20), #17 Exhibit 16 - WSJ Article (8/25/20)) (Williams, J)
September 3, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss #29 Amended Complaint by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. Responses due by 9/17/2020. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 25, 2020 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #37 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incomplete case number on document. The correct case number is 2:20-cv-01445-JCM-VCF.Attorney Gregory Zunino is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William S. Consovoy for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel J Colby Williams. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/24/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss #29 Amended Complaint by Defendant Barbara Cegavske. Responses due by 9/7/2020. (Zunino, Gregory)
August 24, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schrager, Bradley)
August 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #25 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Williams, J)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #23 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Courtney Anne Elgart for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Erik Elias for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cameron T. Norris for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel J Colby Williams. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 NON-OPPOSITION to #9 Motion to Intervene, by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Williams, J)
August 20, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barbara Cegavske by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. No changes to parties. (Williams, J)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Colby Williams Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 8/19/2020 Re: #25 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #25 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner, William S. Consovoy, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state, specifically from the Commonwealth of Virginia, in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 18, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc E. Elias and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 Receipt # 0978-6121339) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (EDS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 VIEW #35 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William S. Consovoy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Colby Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6131862) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Williams, J) Modified on 8/21/2020 (MMM).
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Cameron T. Norris and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Colby Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6130878) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Williams, J)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Courtney Anne Elgart and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 Receipt # 0978-6120634) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (EDS)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abha Khanna for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Henry James Brewster for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas R. McCarthy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Colby Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6128495) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Williams, J)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Reina Almon-Griffin for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Hawley for DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, and Nevada State Democratic Party and approving Designation of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Abha Khanna and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 - Receipt # 0978-6120614) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (EDS)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tyler R. Green for Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, and Republican National Committee and approving Designation of Local Counsel J Colby Williams. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/12/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Henry Brewster and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Scott Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 Receipt #0978-612540) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (EDS)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tyler R. Green and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel J. Colby Williams (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6123468) by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Williams, J)
August 10, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #10 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Aaron D. Ford and Gregory Zunino. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Reina Almon-Griffin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6120600) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Hawley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bradley Schrager (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6120563) by Intervenor Defendants DCCC, DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, Nevada State Democratic Party. (Schrager, Bradley)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Barbara Cegavske. Responses due by 8/24/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/24/2020. (Zunino, Gregory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene as Defendants, by Intervenor Defendants DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee, DCCC, Nevada State Democratic Party. Responses due by 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Answer to Complaint) (Schrager, Bradley)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Barbara Cegavske on 8/6/2020 executed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee re #1 Complaint. (Williams, J)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge James C. Mahan for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01445-JCM-VCF. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/5/2020. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Barbara Cegavske re #1 Complaint. (MR)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel William S. Consovoy, Thomas R. McCarthy, Tyler R. Green, and Cameron T. Norris to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/19/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
August 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Barbara K. Cegavske, in her official capacity as Nevada Secretary of State by Plaintiffs Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. (Campbell, Donald)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Williams, J)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6112464) by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., Nevada Republican Party, Republican National Committee. Proof of service due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Campbell, Donald) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. et al v. Cegavske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republican National Committee
Represented By: J Colby Williams
Represented By: Donald J. Campbell
Represented By: Tyler Green
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada Republican Party
Represented By: J Colby Williams
Represented By: Donald J. Campbell
Represented By: Tyler Green
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By: J Colby Williams
Represented By: Donald J. Campbell
Represented By: Tyler Green
Represented By: William Spencer Consovoy
Represented By: Thomas McCarthy
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske, in her official capacity as Secretary of State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske
Represented By: Gregory Louis Zunino
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DCCC
Represented By: Henry James Brewster
Represented By: Courtney Anne Elgart
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Jonathan Hawley
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DNC Services Corporation/Democratic National Committee
Represented By: Henry James Brewster
Represented By: Courtney Anne Elgart
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Jonathan Hawley
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Pyramid Lake Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Wes Williams
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: Samantha B. Kelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Nevada State Democratic Party
Represented By: Henry James Brewster
Represented By: Courtney Anne Elgart
Represented By: Reina Almon-Griffin
Represented By: Jonathan Hawley
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Represented By: Bradley Scott Schrager
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Walker River Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Wes Williams
Represented By: Jacqueline De Leon
Represented By: Samantha B. Kelty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?