Jones v. Saul
Plaintiff: Claudia Jones
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01452
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of SERVICE BY MAIL re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Claudia Jones. (Boyden, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (HAM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul. (HAM)
August 5, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by CLAUDIA JONES. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyden, John)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6113790) by CLAUDIA JONES. Proof of service due by 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyden, John) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Jones
Represented By: John C. Boyden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?