Bruggenwirth v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dana Marie Bruggenwirth
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security and United States Attorney's Office District of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2020cv01468
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/1/2020. ORDER denying #9 Verified Petition. Having reviewed the Verified Petition for Permission to Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court, the Court notes that David F. Chermol has appeared pro hac vice in six cases within the past three years. The Court further notes that Mr. Chermol has not set forth special circumstances and a showing of good cause for his repeated appearances pursuant to LR 11-2(f)(2). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Petition is DENIED without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Cheung, Allison)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #7 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Attorney's Office District of Nevada served on 8/20/2020. (JQC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN-RECEIPT re #8 Notice. (HAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David F. Chermol and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6138054) by Plaintiff Dana Marie Bruggenwirth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing.EDPA, #2 Exhibit Cert.GoodStanding.SCPA) (Taylor, Hal)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT of #6 Complaint and #7 Summons to Office of Regional Chief Justice and US Attorney General. (HAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to United States Attorney District of Nevada. (HAM)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Dana Marie Bruggenwirth. Proof of service due by 11/9/2020. (HAM)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. At this time, Plaintiff shall not be required to pre-pay the filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is permitted to maintain this action to conclusion without the necessity of prepayment of any additional fees or costs or the giving of a security therefor. The Order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis shall not extend to the issuance of subpoenas at government expense. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint #1 -1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail to: (1) Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear St., Suite 899, San Francisco, California 94105-1545; and (2) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 4400, Washington, D.C. 20530. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from this point forward, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon the attorney, a copy of every pleading, motion or other document submitted for consideration by the court. Plaintiff shall include with the original paper submitted for filing a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was personally served or sent by mail to the defendants or counsel for the defendants. The court may disregard any paper received by a judge which has not been filed with the Clerk, and any paper received by a judge or the Clerk which fails to include a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc Summons and complaint to USM, and by certified mail to Office of Regional Chief Justice and US Attorney General - HAM)
August 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (EDS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David F. Chermol to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/21/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dana Marie Bruggenwirth. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dana Marie Bruggenwirth. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #3 Summons OGC, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruggenwirth v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Marie Bruggenwirth
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney's Office District of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?