RSUI Indemnity Company et al v. Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RSUI Indemnity Company and Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Gary Brennan, Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC and Domonique Browning-Palmer
Case Number: 2:2020cv01484
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Peter J Whalen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer D McKee. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/24/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) Modified on 8/25/2020 to change Judge's signature date (SLD).
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Evanston Insurance Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (McKee, Jennifer)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #10 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Peter J. Whalen shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Peter J Whalen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer D McKee by Plaintiff Evanston Insurance Company. (DRS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SLD) Modified on 8/24/2020 to add Certificate of Good Standing re #12 Notice of Corrected Image.
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RSUI Indemnity Company. Gary Brennan waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/10/2020. (Sluga, Gena)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RSUI Indemnity Company. Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC waiver sent on 8/11/2020, answer due 10/10/2020. (Sluga, Gena)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Cara L. Christian is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Evanston Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company added. (McKee, Jennifer)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by RSUI Indemnity Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Alleghany Corporation for RSUI Indemnity Company added. (Sluga, Gena)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Peter J Whalen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/24/2020. (no image attached) (DRS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gary Brennan, Domonique Browning-Palmer, Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
August 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DRS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6119677) by RSUI Indemnity Company, Evanston Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Sluga, Gena) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSUI Indemnity Company et al v. Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Brennan
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sportsman's Royal Manor, LLC
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domonique Browning-Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSUI Indemnity Company
Represented By: Peter J. Whalen
Represented By: Cara L. Christian
Represented By: Gena L. Sluga
Represented By: Jennifer D. McKee
Represented By: Peter J Whalen
Represented By: Cara Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter J. Whalen
Represented By: Cara L. Christian
Represented By: Gena L. Sluga
Represented By: Jennifer D. McKee
Represented By: Peter J Whalen
Represented By: Cara Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?