Doe et al v. Equipo Academy et al
Plaintiff: Mother of Jane Doe Janet Doe, Minor Jane Doe, Father of Jane Doe John Doe, Jane Doe, John Doe and Janet Doe
Defendant: Estella Spaine, Equipo Academy and Benjamin Salkowe
Case Number: 2:2020cv01490
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 24 ERRATA to #23 Reply by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Olson, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Olson, James)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #21 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #21 using the appropriate docket entry title "REPLY". Document #21 terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 ERROR: Document not in compliance with LR IC 2-2(c). Incorrect event selected by Attorney. Attorney advised to refile correctly. Document #21 terminated. MOTION to Dismiss #15 Response, #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (Olson, James)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #7 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Replies due by 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order to file Reply re #15 Response by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Olson, James)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 5/25/2021. Motions due by 6/24/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Janet Doe, John Doe. (Cohen, Douglas)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Janet Doe, John Doe. Replies due by 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- First Amended Complaint) (Cohen, Douglas)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #7 Motion to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Janet Doe, John Doe. (Cohen, Douglas)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order regarding Plaintiffs' Opposition Brief Deadline for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, Janet Doe, John Doe. (Cohen, Douglas)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kara B. Hendricks, Whitney L. Welch-Kirmsey and Greenberg Traurig, LLP for Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Hendricks, Kara)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #8 . Incorrect event selected by attorney. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b), which states: No attorney may withdraw after appearing in a case except by leave of the court after notice has been served on the affected client and opposing counsel. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #8 using the appropriate Motion/Stipulation pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b). Document #8 terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IA 11-6 and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Kara Hendricks . CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. Document #8 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Hendricks, Kara)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. Responses due by 9/11/2020. (Welch-Kirmse, Whitney)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Stephanie M. Zinna on behalf of Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Zinna, Stephanie)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. (Welch-Kirmse, Whitney)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Jane Doe, Janet Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Service, #2 Exhibit Proof of Serving Courtesy Copy) (Cohen, Douglas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/11/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/26/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equipo Academy, Benjamin Salkowe, Estella Spaine. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Welch-Kirmse, Whitney)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-813973-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6120791) by Estella Spaine, Benjamin Salkowe, Equipo Academy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A -- Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit Ex B -- Acceptance of Service, #3 Exhibit Ex C -- First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit Ex D -- Email, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Welch-Kirmse, Whitney) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe et al v. Equipo Academy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mother of Jane Doe Janet Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minor Jane Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Father of Jane Doe John Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Doe
Represented By: Daniel Bravo
Represented By: Angela Jill Guingcangco
Represented By: Douglas M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Spaine
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Stephanie M. Zinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equipo Academy
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Stephanie M. Zinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Salkowe
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: James R. Olson
Represented By: Stephanie M. Zinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?