Demarco v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angelo Demarco
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01501
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JQC)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/15/2021. Motions due by 4/14/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/22/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harper, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/4/2020.(Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #5 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney James Harper. The wrong event was selected. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Notice Other to Statement in Removal Case. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT in Removal Case NOTICE Signed Statement Concerning Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Harper, James) Modified on 8/20/2020 to change event (SLD).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Harper, James)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 8/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 13, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial, Case Number A-20-812719-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6125171) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harper, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demarco v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James Ernest Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Demarco
Represented By: Matthew Grant Holland
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?