WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01506
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice John N. Ellison and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/15/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Richard P. Lewis and approving Designation of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/15/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John N. Ellison and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6168606) by Plaintiff WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC. (Pisanelli, James)
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard P. Lewis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel James J. Pisanelli (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6168592) by Plaintiff WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC. (Pisanelli, James)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION MOTION for Extension of Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company. (Hafen, Tyson) Modified event on 9/2/2020; event changed from MOTION to STIPULATION, per LR IC 2-2 (MMM).
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 3 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP, by Plaintiff WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC. (Spinelli, Debra) Modified text on 9/1/2020 (MMM).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Venetian Casino Resort, LLC, Other Affiliate MBR Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate MLV Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate CCP Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate LV CUT Restaurant, LLC, Other Affiliate LAL Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate SRG Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate SBH Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate S4S Maui Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate FSNY Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate DS Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Wolfgang Puck Worldwide, Inc., Other Affiliate WPEXPAU, LLC, Other Affiliate BH Management, LLC, Other Affiliate MBR Management, LLC, Other Affiliate BW4S Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate BAC Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Park Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate PR Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate PAL Pool, LLC, Other Affiliate HBA Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate SINGRMA, LLC, Other Affiliate Ist Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate BAH Restaurant Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate SRS Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate 2017B Restaurant Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Wolfgang Puck Express Licensing, LLC for WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC added. (Spinelli, Debra)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/2020. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). Plaintiff failed to file a certificate of interested parties. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties no later than August 24, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John N. Ellison and Richard P. Lewis to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 8/31/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Zurich American Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6128893) by WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC. Proof of service due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Pisanelli, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC v. Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Tyson E Hafen
Represented By: Daniel B Heidtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WP 6 Restaurant Management Group, LLC
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Richard P. Lewis
Represented By: Debra Spinelli
Represented By: John N Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?