Willard v. Ainsworth Game Technology Inc
Plaintiff: Dennis Willard
Defendant: Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01513
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Birgitte Marie Gingold and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karyn M. Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6196093) by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc., Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Taylor, Karyn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc. (Taylor, Karyn)
September 2, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/2/2020. Each non-governmental party is required to file a certificate of interested parties concurrently with its first appearance in a case. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). The Court previously ordered each party to file a certificate of interested parties by August 24, 2020. Docket No. 25. Plaintiff has failed to do so. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file a certificate of interested parties by September 9, 2020. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN SANCTIONS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JA)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 27, 2020 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #29 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Karyn Taylor. The wrong event was selected. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Notice Other to Motion Extend Time. No further action is required at this time. Do not refile document. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 ERRATA to #29 Notice (Other) by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc., Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.. (Taylor, Karyn)
August 26, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time (First Request) to File a Proposed Discovery Plan re: 25 Minute Order, NOTICE to Request for 30-Day Extension of Time to File A Proposed Discovery Plan; Proposed Order by Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc. re #28 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Taylor, Karyn)Modified on 8/27/2020 to change event (SLD).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw Shelly M. Andrew as counsel for Plaintiff Dennis Willard. By no later than 9/23/2020, Plaintiff must file either a notice of appearance of counsel or a notice of intent to proceed pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc by mail to Plaintiff HAM)
August 24, 2020 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc. Ainsworth Game Technology, Limited added. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Taylor, Karyn) Modified on 8/24/2020 to add Interested Party (SLD).
August 24, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Karyn M Taylor on behalf of Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc., Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.. (Taylor, Karyn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/18/2020. This case has been transferred to this District. Docket No. 20. The parties must each file a certificate of interested parties by August 24, 2020. Local Rule 7.1-1(c). In addition, the parties must file a proposed discovery schedule by September 18, 2020. Local Rule 26-1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JA)
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01513-RFB-NJK. (no image attached) (SLD)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/2020. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
August 17, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/2020. This action was received on* 8/17/2020* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Western District of Washington* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01513-APG-NJK. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2020. Verified Petition due by 10/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01970. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Counter Defendant Dennis Willard, Plaintiff Dennis Willard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/4/2020, (Andrew, Shelly) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion to Transfer Case to the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.Per LCR 3(i), this case will be transferred 14 days after the date of this order, 8/14/2020.(LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY, filed by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Shelly M. Andrew filed by Counter Defendant Dennis Willard, Plaintiff Dennis Willard re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Andrew, Shelly) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Dennis Willard filed by Counter Defendant Dennis Willard, Plaintiff Dennis Willard re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Andrew, Shelly) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE, by Counter Defendant Dennis Willard, Plaintiff Dennis Willard, to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a). (Andrew, Shelly) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendants by Dennis Willard.(Andrew, Shelly) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 23, 2019 ***Deadlines terminated. The Court notifies the parties that the deadlines contained in the #6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT are suspended, to be reset if necessary after the Court's ruling on Defendant's #10 MOTION to Transfer Case's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a). (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Ryan P Comstock filed by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc, Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Breanne Martell filed by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc, Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a) (Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case 's Venue Under 28 USC 1404(a), filed by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc, Counter Claimant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/17/2020, (Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to attach document Exhibit A re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; , COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Dennis Willard by Ainsworth Game Technology Inc.(Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ainsworth Game Technology Limited for Ainsworth Game Technology Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ainsworth Game Technology Inc (Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/27/2019, Joint Status Report due by 1/3/2020, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Ainsworth Game Technology Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/11/2019. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to attach document re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1-4)(Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Ryan Comstock re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc. (Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 19-2-10562-31; (Receipt # 0981-6033984), filed by Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1-4)(Martell, Breanne) [Transferred from Washington Western on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willard v. Ainsworth Game Technology Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Willard
Represented By: Shelly M. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ainsworth Game Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Breanne Sheetz Martell
Represented By: Birgitte Gingold
Represented By: Karyn M Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?