HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. and Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01515
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Brenner, Darren)
September 29, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Replies due by 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Companys Opposition To Motion To Remand; Declaration Of Scott Gizer, #2 Exhibit A - 2018.07.30 Order Affirming In Part & Reversing & Remanding In Part, #3 Exhibit B - Bayview Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - PennyMac Corp. Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - DLJ v. OR Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Deutsche v. OR Complaint with Exhibits, #7 Exhibit F - Cert of Authority Fidelity, #8 Exhibit G - Resident Agency license, #9 Exhibit H - Fidelity printout, #10 Exhibit I - Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada printout) (Gizer, Scott)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/26/2021. Motions due by 5/26/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #11 , #12 , #13 Motions to Dismiss (First Request). Responses due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #11 Motion to Dismiss, #12 Motion to Dismiss, #13 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, National Association. (Robbins, Lindsay)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc., Corporate Parent FNTG HOLDINGS, LLC for Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company added. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Case by Defendants Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc., Fidelity National Title Group, Inc., Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Ancona, Esq.) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/29/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/30/2020. (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff HSBC Bank USA, National Association. Responses due by 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Brenner, Darren)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. served on 8/27/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay) Modified event on 9/1/2020 per LR IC 2-2 (MMM).
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #6 . Attorney Kevin S. Sinclair is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Samuel Sinclair. and of Designation of Local Counsel per Local Rule IA 11-1(b) (Sinclair, Kevin)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company served on 8/25/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HSBC Bank USA, National Association. Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc. served on 8/25/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HSBC Bank USA, National Association that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent HSBC North America Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC USA, Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, National Association added. (Robbins, Lindsay)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/17/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/1/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 17, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Nevada's Eighth District Court, Case Number A-20-819620-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6130286) by Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit One, #3 Exhibit Two, #4 Exhibit Three) (Sinclair, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HSBC Bank USA, National Association v. Fidelity National Title Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Agency of Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Sinclair
Represented By: Gary L. Compton
Represented By: Scott E Gizer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HSBC Bank USA, National Association
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?