Benchmark Contracting, Inc. v. Nevada Partners Inc.
Plaintiff: Benchmark Contracting, Inc. d/b/a Cobblestone Construction
Defendant: Nevada Partners Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01528
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Remanding Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. I THEREFORE ORDER that the case is remanded to the state court from which it was removed for all further proceedings. The clerk of the court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Opposition to Nevada Partners Inc., Motion to Dismiss Complaint on an Order Shortening Time re #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Benchmark Contracting, Inc.. (Parker III, Theodore)
September 20, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Defendant Nevada Partners Inc.. (Martin, Daryl)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Nevada Partners Inc.. Responses due by 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Martin, Daryl)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading. Response due 9/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Response to #1 Motion by Plaintiff Benchmark Contracting, Inc. (Parker III, Theodore) Modified text on 9/2/2020 to reflect entry is a Response, not a Reply (EDS).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Show Cause Why This Action Should Not Be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Re: #3 Petition for Removal. Nevada Partners, Inc. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2020. Failure to respond to this order by that date will result in remand without further notice. Benchmark Contracting, Inc. may file a response by 10/9/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-816681-C, (Filing fee $ 400) by Nevada Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nevada Partners Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Daryl)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading (First Request) by Defendant Nevada Partners Inc.. Responses due by 9/1/2020. (Martin, Daryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchmark Contracting, Inc. v. Nevada Partners Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Partners Inc.
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Contracting, Inc. d/b/a Cobblestone Construction
Represented By: Mahogany A Turfley
Represented By: Theodore Parker III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?