Houston Jr v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Brick Pommeroy Houston Jr
Defendant: Thompson, Warden Brian Williams, Brawn Keyturner, Estill, Burchem, J. Nash and James Dzurenda
Case Number: 2:2020cv01532
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic NOTICE from HDSP, re ECF No. #4 IFP Application, that Plaintiff Brick Pommeroy Houston Jr. has transferred to SDCC. (KR)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeroy Houston Jr. (MR)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees or IFP due 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/20/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP w/Instructions attached and sent electronically - JM) Modified text on 8/20/2020 (SLD).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brick Pommeroy Houston Jr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Letter) (JM)
August 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Jr v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawn Keyturner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burchem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brick Pommeroy Houston Jr
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?