Selvester v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elva Teresa Selvester
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01536
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chantal Jenkins on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Jenkins, Chantal)
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #7 Summons Issued. Andrew Saul served on 9/16/2020. (JQC)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL (7018 3090 0001 1133 3983) & (7018 3090 0001 1133 3990) re #6 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued. (JQC)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (cc: USM, AUSA - JQC) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/1/2020) (JQC). (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/1/2020) (JQC).
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Elva Teresa Selvester. Proof of service due by 11/26/2020. (JQC) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/28/2020) (JQC). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 Exhibit) (JQC). Modified on 8/31/2020 to restrict access to Exhibits per LR IC 6-1 and FRCP 5.2 (MMM).
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file his answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint in this case.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon Defendant a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 8/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MMM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Document terminated as entered in error by Clerk's OfficeConsent Or Declination to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge in a Social Security Case by Elva Teresa Selvester. (JQC) Modified on 8/25/2020 (MMM).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #1 Consent) (JQC).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Elva Teresa Selvester. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC) Modified on 8/20/2020 to restrict access to Complaint pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).
August 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selvester v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elva Teresa Selvester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?