Mehta v. Nutribullet, L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Jagdish Mehta
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C., Nutriliving, L.L.C., PriceCostco International, Inc., Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. and Capital Brands, L.L.C.
Cross Claimant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01550
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #12 , #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/23/2021. Motions due by 9/22/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 First Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jagdish Mehta. (Raich, Sagar)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant PriceCostco International, Inc.. (Federico, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Cross Claimant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Minute Order Removal Case, by Cross Claimant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Deeming #7 Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #7 Order to Show Cause by Cross Claimant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Nutribullet Corporate Record, #3 Exhibit Capital Brands Corporate Record, #4 Exhibit Homeland Housewares Corporate Record, #5 Exhibit Call to Action Corporate Record, #6 Exhibit Nutraliving Corporate Record, #7 Exhibit Costco Wholesale Corporate Record, #8 Exhibit Priceco California Corporate Record) (Federico, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/5/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/5/2020.), CROSSCLAIM against Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., Nutribullet, L.L.C., Capital Brands, L.L.C., Call To Action, L.L.C., Nutriliving, L.L.C. by Costco Wholesale Corporation. filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 8/21/2020; Cross-Claim only against Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. (SLD).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Federico, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-818725-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6137705) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Proof of service due by 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Petition, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mehta v. Nutribullet, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutriliving, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PriceCostco International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Federico
Represented By: Brandon P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Brands, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jagdish Mehta
Represented By: Sagar R. Raich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Federico
Represented By: Brandon P Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?