Thompson v. Lugo et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Thompson
Defendant: Richard Lugo, Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01578
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 10/7/2021. Motions due by 11/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 21, 2020 Filing 16 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re 15 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order,,, Minute Order,, by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/19/2020. ORDER denying #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' stipulated discovery plan and scheduling order is denied without prejudice as they do not provide sufficient good cause to warrant extending the dates into 2022. The parties shall review the amended Local Rules and shall file a compliant plan with ample good cause for any special scheduling review within 7 days. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Robert D. Vannah and John B. Greene for Cynthia Ann Thompson substituted for Attorneys Robert W. Curtis and Jie Amy Sun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/13/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 12, 2020 Filing 13 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. (Dickinson, Bruce)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Ann Thompson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Substitute Attorney NOTICE of Substitution of Attorneys by Cynthia Ann Thompson. (Greene, John) Modified event in accordance with the local rules on 9/24/2020 (EDS).
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Richard Lugo, Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.(Dickinson, Bruce) Modified text on 9/22/2020 (EDS).
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/31/2020.(Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to 5 Minute Order,,,,, by Defendants Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/26/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants show cause as to why the Court should not remand this action to Clark County District Court for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Defendant Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC must provide the citizenships of each of its members, and if any of those members are themselves limited liability companies, partnerships, or other types of unincorporated associations, Defendant must provide their citizenships as well. See Johnson v. Colombia Props. Anchorage, LP, 437 F.3d 894, 899 (9th Cir. 2006) ("[L]ike a partnership, an LLC is a citizen of every state of which its owners/members are citizens."). Defendants shall have until September 4, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being remanded to Clark County District Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to address the jurisdictional issues implicated by this Order, Plaintiff shall have until September 4, 2020, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, discussing the concerns herein raised.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/25/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 9/9/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Walmart, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Dickinson, Bruce)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-817031-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6142392) by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC. Proof of service due by 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dickinson, Bruce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Lugo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Jie Amy Sun
Represented By: Robert W. Curtis
Represented By: Robert D. Vannah
Represented By: John B. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Lugo
Represented By: Jamieson N. Poe
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Jamieson N. Poe
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jamieson N. Poe
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?