McElvogue v. Comenity Bank et al
Plaintiff: Robert McElvogue
Defendant: Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01708
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC added. (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Thompson, Jeremy)
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by TransUnion, LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer)
October 29, 2020 Party Comenity Bank terminated per #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS)
October 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Comenity Bank ONLY by Plaintiff Robert McElvogue. (Alpert, Steven)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James J. Morrissey for Comenity Bank and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/20/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Comenity Bank answer due 11/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James J. Morrissey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sarah A. Ferguson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6213337) by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Ferguson, Sarah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [proposed] Order for Defendant Comenity Bank to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Ferguson, Sarah) Modified on 10/15/2020 (EDS).
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Comenity Bank that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Alliance Data Systems Corporation for Comenity Bank added. (Ferguson, Sarah)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by TransUnion, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by TransUnion, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2020.(Bergh, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Time for Equifax to File Answer Re: #1 Complaint. Answer due 11/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert McElvogue. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 9/23/2020. (Alpert, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert McElvogue. TransUnion, LLC served on 9/23/2020. (Alpert, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert McElvogue re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Comenity Bank served on 9/23/2020. (Alpert, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM)
September 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (HAM)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert McElvogue. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Alpert, Steven)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comenity Bank, Equifax Information Services, LLC, TransUnion, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6170922) by Robert McElvogue. Proof of service due by 12/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Comenity Bank, #3 Summons Equifax Information Services, LLC, #4 Summons TransUnion, LLC) (Alpert, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McElvogue v. Comenity Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: James J. Morrissey
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Represented By: Trevor Waite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McElvogue
Represented By: Steven A Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?