Zanazanian v. Saul
Plaintiff: Dawn Zanazanian
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01720
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Extend Time re #5 Complaint (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Certified Administrative Record and Answer re #5 Complaint by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit) (Cheung, Allison)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPTS 7018 2290 0001 8797 0793 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0786 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 9/22/2020. (MR)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 2290 0001 8797 0793 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0786 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA re #5 Complaint. (MR)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (cc: AUSA summons w/ECF #5 to USM - MR)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Dawn Zanazanian. Proof of service due by 12/17/2020. (MR)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file #1 -1 the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MMM)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MMM)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dawn Zanazanian. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kalagian, Marc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dawn Zanazanian. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Kalagian, Marc) Modified on 9/17/2020 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zanazanian v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Zanazanian
Represented By: Marc V Kalagian
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?