Davis v. James River Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Christi Davis
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01729
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss defendant James River. Defendant already dismissed. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/14/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant James River Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Defendant James River Insurance Company by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Miletovic, Kristina)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss (Oral Argument Requested) by Defendant James River Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Policy (En Route to Pick Up), #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Policy (En Route to Deliver)) (Miletovic, Kristina) Modified on 9/21/2020 (EDS).
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 9/18/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/3/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
September 17, 2020 Defendant CSAA General Insurance Company added per #1 Petition for Removal. (EDS)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James River Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent James River Group Inc. for James River Insurance Company added. (Miletovic, Kristina)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-818067-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6175508) by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Miletovic, Kristina) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. James River Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Miletovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?