Etzig v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Plaintiff: Jordan D Etzig
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv01732
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Jordan D Etzig. Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Gliner, Mitchell)
November 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. Responses due by 11/20/2020. (Demaree, Lindsay)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arjun Rao for JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lindsay C Demaree. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alisa Marie Taormina for JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lindsay C Demaree. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alisa Taormina and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lindsay Demaree (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6243422) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Demaree, Lindsay)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Arjun P. Rao and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lindsay Demaree (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6243409) by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Demaree, Lindsay)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation; JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association answer due 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Demaree, Lindsay)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan D Etzig re #4 Summons Issued. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association served on 9/21/2020. (Gliner, Mitchell)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jordan D Etzig. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6176815) by Jordan D Etzig. Proof of service due by 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gliner, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etzig v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan D Etzig
Represented By: Mitchell D Gliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Represented By: Lindsay C Demaree
Represented By: Arjun Rao
Represented By: Alisa Marie Taormina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?