Joyce et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith and Richard K. Joyce
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company, Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC f/ka/ Pharmacia Corporation, Warner-Lambert Company LLC, Pharmacia LLC, Pharmacia Corporation and Warner-Lambert Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01736
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #14 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hepworth, Justin)
November 12, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Evans, Kelly)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER approving ECF No. #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel M. Meyers and approving Designation of Local Counsel Justin S. Hepworth. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER approving ECF No. #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Sharon D. Mayo and approving Designation of Local Counsel Justin S. Hepworth. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/6/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #14 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Jeffrey H. Horowitz shall have the document signed by an active commissioned Notary Public (stamp) in order to have this Court consider the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
November 5, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #10 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith, Richard K. Joyce. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Connor G. Sheehan, #2 Index Index to Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 New York state court complaint and answer, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 New York State Court Order Tolling SoL and SoR, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint - clean version, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint - redline version) (Sheehan, Connor)
November 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel M. Meyers and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Justin S. Hepworth (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6244761) by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Hepworth, Justin)
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sharon D. Mayo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Justin S. Hepworth (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6244755) by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Hepworth, Justin)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 VIEW #22 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey H. Horowitz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Justin S. Hepworth (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6244741) by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. (Hepworth, Justin) Modified on 11/13/2020 (MMM).
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Mosier and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian David Nettles. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/26/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey H. Horowitz; Sharon D. Mayo; Daniel Meyers to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/5/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert A. Mosier and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian D. Nettles (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6224157) by Plaintiffs Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith, Richard K. Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Nettles, Brian)
October 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC. Responses due by 11/5/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/6/2020. (Evans, Kelly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Parke, Davis & Company, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia LLC, Warner-Lambert Company LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Pfizer International LLC for Parke, Davis & Company; Other Affiliate Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Pfizer, Inc.; Other Affiliate Wyeth Holdings LLC for Pharmacia LLC added. (Evans, Kelly)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Connor Sheehan and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian David Nettles. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Connor G. Sheehan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian D. Nettles (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6199593) by Plaintiffs Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith, Richard K. Joyce. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Nettles, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Robert Mosier, Connor Sheehan to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/5/2020. (no image attached) (JQC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF Nos. #1 and #2 were not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-1 and 10-2. Documents are improperly formatted. Attorney Brian Nettles is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning these documents at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Defendants re #1 Complaint. (JQC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/21/2020) (JQC). (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/21/2020) (MMM). Modified on 9/21/2020 to reflect correct attorney's name - nef regenerated (MMM).
September 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith, Richard K. Joyce. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nettles, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6177404) by Richard K. Joyce, Marie Coppla, Jo Goldsmith. Proof of service due by 12/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Parke, Davis & Company LLC, #3 Summons Summons to Pfizer, Inc., #4 Summons Summons to Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, #5 Summons Summons to Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company) (Nettles, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joyce et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Coppla
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Connor Gordon Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Adam Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Goldsmith
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Connor Gordon Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Adam Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard K. Joyce
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Connor Gordon Sheehan
Represented By: Robert Adam Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Company
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC f/ka/ Pharmacia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company LLC
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia LLC
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner-Lambert Company
Represented By: Justin S Hepworth
Represented By: Chad R. Fears
Represented By: Daniel Meyers
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Horowitz
Represented By: Kelly A. Evans
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?