Cuyler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Cuyler
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01737
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #20 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Motions due by 4/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/11/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER granting #19 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/10/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
October 22, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Scott Schulte for Carolyn S Cuyler and approving Designation of Local Counsel Mike H.T. Nguyen. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Barry JD Levy withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/6/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 10/6/2020 to reflect correct attorney (DKJ).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation to Substitute Attorney Greenberg Traurig LLP as counsel in place and stead of Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/6/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Steve Schulte and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mike H.T. Nguyen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6199709) by Plaintiff Carolyn S Cuyler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Texas Bar Certificate) (Nguyen, Mike)
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01737-RFB-BNW. (no image attached) (AF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mike H.T. Nguyen for Plaintiff Carolyn S Cuyler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nguyen, Mike)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen on behalf of Plaintiff Carolyn S Cuyler. (Nguyen, Mike)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated added. (Swanis, Eric)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric W. Swanis on behalf of Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Substitute Attorneys by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Swanis, Eric)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/21/2020. This action was received on* 9/18/2020* pursuant to a court order directing transfer from the* Arizona* and assigned case number 2:20-cv-01737-RFB-EJY. All future documents must bear said correct case number. Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2020. Verified Petition due by 11/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copy mailed to Barry JD Levy - DRS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Barry Levy and Richard B North to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/2/2020. (no image attached) (DRS)
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-01704. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (DRS)
September 18, 2020 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Nevada via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER (FOURTH). That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer the cases listed on Schedule A to appropriate districts for further proceedings. See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/10/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]
June 14, 2017 Remark (CD) MDL 15-2641 (TCA) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]
June 8, 2017 ***Attorney Richard B North, Jr for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated and C R Bard Incorporated added pursuant to Notice of Appearance filed 6/8/17 in Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC at (Doc. 6253). (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-01704-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14287813 filed by Carolyn S Cuyler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuyler v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Eric W. Swanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn S Cuyler
Represented By: Barry JD Levy
Represented By: Mike Hieu Thien Nguyen
Represented By: Steven Scott Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?