Colvin v. M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Parnell Colvin
Defendant: M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01765
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/12/2021 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The written evaluation statements must be delivered to chamber or (if statements and exhibits are over 100 pages, please send in multiple e-mails.) emailed to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov, not later than 4:00 p.m., January 5, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Rosenthal, Robert)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Parnell Colvin. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Olevic-Saleh, Ines)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Defendant M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.. Responses due by 12/1/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/1/2021. (Rosenthal, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #5 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Parnell Colvin. (Olevic-Saleh, Ines)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to M.J. Dean Construction, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Parnell Colvin. (Olevic-Saleh, Ines)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.J. Dean Construction, Inc. (Filing fee $400) by Parnell Colvin. Proof of service due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt No. NVLAS071973) (MR)
September 22, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvin v. M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.J. Dean Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Martin A Little
Represented By: Robert L Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parnell Colvin
Represented By: Ines Olevic-Saleh
Represented By: Jesse M. Sbaih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?