Sala v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sala
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01786
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Shelley Hebert; Ian Morrison to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/2/2020. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by The Prudential Insurance Company of America that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America added. (Mills, Michael)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/2/2021.(Mills, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Sala. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 10/28/2020. (McKennon, Robert)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Andrea Soliz and approving Designation of Local Counsel William Russel Killip, Jr. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Robert J. McKennon and approving Designation of Local Counsel William Russel Killip, Jr. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Jennifer Sala. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Killip, William)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Jennifer Sala. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Killip, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/5/2020 Re: #5 and #6 Motions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petitions. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petitions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #5 and #6 are DEFERRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners, Robert J. McKennon and Andrea Soliz, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from the State Bar of California in which Petitioners have been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petitions.Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 VIEW #9 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Soliz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel William R Killip (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6198027) by Plaintiff Jennifer Sala. (Killip, William) Modified on 10/13/2020 (DKJ).
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 VIEW #8 corrected image re MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert J McKennon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel William R Killip (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6198023) by Plaintiff Jennifer Sala. (Killip, William) Modified on 10/13/2020 (DKJ).
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Robert J. McKennon, Andrea Soliz to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/9/2020. (no image attached) (JQC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (JQC) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/28/2020) (JQC).
September 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jennifer Sala. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Killip, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Sala (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6186522) by Jennifer Sala. Proof of service due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Killip, William) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sala v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Shelley Hebert
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Represented By: Ian Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sala
Represented By: Andrea Soliz
Represented By: Robert J. McKennon
Represented By: William Russel Killip, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?