Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Raydeo Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund and Political Action Together Fund
Defendant: McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., United States Fire Insurance Company, Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, Suretec Insurance Company, Raydeo Enterprises, Inc. and M A Mortenson Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01795
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) with Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund. (Wolff, Laura)
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund. Suretec Insurance Company served on 10/26/2020; United States Fire Insurance Company served on 10/26/2020. (Wolff, Laura)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). M A Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, and Raydeo Enterprises, Inc. answers due 12/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified on 10/30/2020 to include defendants' names (MMM).
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Raydeo Enterprises, Inc. on 10/29/2020 executed by Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund. (Wolff, Laura)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund. (Wolff, Laura) Modified on 10/29/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund. M A Mortenson Company served on 10/13/2020; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc. served on 10/13/2020; Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium served on 10/13/2020. (Wolff, Laura)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
September 25, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Martin, Daryl)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M A Mortenson Company, McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, Raydeo Enterprises, Inc., Suretec Insurance Company, United States Fire Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6187530) by Local 2001 Political Action Fund, Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund, Political Action Together Fund, Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001, Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund. Proof of service due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons M A Mortenson Company, #3 Summons McCarthy Building Companies, Inc., #4 Summons Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium, #5 Summons Raydeo Enterprises, Inc., #6 Summons Suretec Insurance Company, #7 Summons United States Fire Insurance Company) (Martin, Daryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Raydeo Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades Labor-Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 2001 Political Action Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glaziers Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Glaziers Market Recovery Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IUPAT District Council 16, Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glassworkers Local Union 2001
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Glazing Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Political Action Together Fund
Represented By: Laura J. Wolff
Represented By: Daryl E Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.
Represented By: George F. Ogilvie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortenson-McCarthy Las Vegas Stadium
Represented By: George F. Ogilvie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suretec Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raydeo Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M A Mortenson Company
Represented By: George F. Ogilvie, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?