High Sec Labs Ltd. v. iPGARD Inc.
Plaintiff: High Sec Labs Ltd.
Defendant: iPGARD Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01797
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 2ND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel GUY YONAY to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/26/2020. (no image attached) (LE)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER approving ECF No. #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Daniel Melman and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/9/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Melman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6248404) by Plaintiff High Sec Labs Ltd.. (Austin, F.)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER approving ECF No. #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Asheesh P. Puri for iPGARD Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel for W. West Allen. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been electronically distributed pursuant to the NEF and physically mailed to Attorney Asheesh Puri on 10/29/2020 - AB)
October 28, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Asheesh P. Puri and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel W. West Allen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6233581) by Defendant iPGARD Inc.. (Allen, W.)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting ECF No. #12 Stipulation re ECF No. #1 Complaint. Answer/response due by 12/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by iPGARD Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Allen, W.)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR 45-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant iPGARD Inc.. (Allen, W.)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sasha G Rao for iPGARD Inc., and approving Designation of Local Counsel W. West Allen. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/20/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sasha G. Rao and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel W. West Allen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6219677) by Defendant iPGARD Inc.. (Allen, W.)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by High Sec Labs Ltd.. iPGARD Inc. served on 9/30/2020. (Austin, F.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by High Sec Labs Ltd.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Austin, F.)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-01797-MMD-BNW. (no image attached) (MMM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2020. The Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (JM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to iPGARD Inc. (JM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Daniel J. Melman, Guy Yonay to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 10/12/2020. (no image attached) (JM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (JM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6187864) by High Sec Labs Ltd.. Proof of service due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12) (Austin, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Sec Labs Ltd. v. iPGARD Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Sec Labs Ltd.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Daniel Melman
Represented By: Guy Yonay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iPGARD Inc.
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Asheesh Paul Puri
Represented By: W. West Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?