Sennain v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jamila Ahmed Jennain and Jamila Ahmed Sennain
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv01869
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul by Jamila Ahmed Sennain. No changes to parties. (DRS)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul by Jamila Ahmed Sennain. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se 13) (JM)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) is DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Complaint, PS13 to P - JM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Consent for Electronic Service of Documents by Plaintiff Jamila Ahmed Sennain. (DRS)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DRS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. NOTICE of assignment of case to a United States Magistrate Judge and consent form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge, #2 Consent to Service by email form - both mailed to P with Advisory Letter this date) (DRS)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jamila Ahmed Jennain. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (DRS)
October 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT) Modified text on 10/7/2020 (EDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sennain v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Ahmed Jennain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Ahmed Sennain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?