Siegfried v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Siegfried
Defendant: Jess Lopez and Loya Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01905
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Serve by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Extend Time re Service (First Request). See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #14 : Event changed by Court from Motion for Miscellaneous Relief to Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, per LR IC 2-2. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Serve Defendant Jess Lopez by Publication by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. Responses due by 12/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Prince, Dennis)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Summons and Complainton Defendant Jess Lopez by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. (Prince, Dennis) Modified motion type on 12/7/2020 (MMM).
November 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/9/2021. Motions due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/30/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. (Prince, Dennis)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Modified on 11/21/2020 to restrict access: transcript restricted (MMM).) (Prince, Dennis)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. (Strong, Kevin)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court (First Request). Replies due by 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply re #4 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. (Strong, Kevin) Modified on 11/6/2020 (EDS).
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Loya Insurance Company. Replies due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Binding Arbitration Agreement and Covenant Not to Execute) (Zeppenfeld, Kristopher)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Loya Insurance Company. (Johnson, M.)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal,, by Plaintiff Debbie Siegfried. Responses due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Prince, Dennis)
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/13/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/28/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 12, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
October 12, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Loya Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Johnson, M.)
October 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-820693-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6208517) by Loya Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 12/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, M.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegfried v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loya Insurance Company
Represented By: M. Bradley Johnson
Represented By: Kristopher T Zeppenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Siegfried
Represented By: Dennis Michael Prince
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?