Great American Insurance Company v. Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o CENTENNIAL EXECUTIVE SUITES, LLC, GLOBE FIRE SPRINKLER CORPORATION and A-1 National Fire Co. doing business as All American Fire
Case Number: 2:2020cv01907
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation.(Turtzo, Christopher)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Demand for Jury Trial by A-1 National Fire Co. re #5 Answer to Complaint,. (Larsen, Eric)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #6 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Eric Larsen advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by A-1 National Fire Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliates Summit Fire Protection, Maxum Insurance Company added (Larsen, Eric) Modified on 11/23/2020 to add other affiliates (DKJ).
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by A-1 National Fire Co.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/7/2021.(Larsen, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 26, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Great American Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Aman, Nathan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6228424) by Great American Insurance Company, A-1 National Fire Co., dba All American Fire. Proof of service due by 1/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Aman, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 26, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Globe Fire Sprinkler Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY a/s/o CENTENNIAL EXECUTIVE SUITES, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBE FIRE SPRINKLER CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 National Fire Co. doing business as All American Fire
Represented By: Eric R. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan Aman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?