Front Sight Management, LLC v. State of Nevada
Plaintiff: Front Sight Management, LLC doing business as Front Sight Firearms Training Institute
Defendant: State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2020cv01921
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 21 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) for Responses and Replies on Several Outstanding Motions by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #9 Motion, #10 Motion #17 Motion. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 12/21/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 11/20/2020 (JQC).
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Respond to Motion for Abstention and Motion for Remand re #17 Motion, #9 Motion, #10 Motion by Defendant State of Nevada. (Newby, Craig)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION For Abstention by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 16 First STIPULATION Order to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #7 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/9/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Document missing attorney's signature on page 2.Attorney Leslie Stovall is advised to file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #9 . (no image attached) (SLD)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 APPENDIX of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention Part II to #9 Motion by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 APPENDIX of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Abstention Part I to #9 Motion by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 USC 1414(c) by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION For Abstention by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Stovall, Leslie)
November 11, 2020 Filing 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Front Sight Management, LLC. (Stovall, Leslie)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant State of Nevada. Responses due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Newby, Craig)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State of Nevada. (Clinton, Sabrena)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Front Sight Management, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stovall, Leslie)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 ERROR: Incorrect document filed in this case in error and is terminated. CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Front Sight Management, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stovall, Leslie) Modified on 10/27/2020 (DKJ).
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/16/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/31/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial District Court, Case Number CV20-0474, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6215116) by State of Nevada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Clinton, Sabrena) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Front Sight Management, LLC v. State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Front Sight Management, LLC doing business as Front Sight Firearms Training Institute
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Represented By: Ross Heber Moynihan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Sabrena Clinton
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?