Infogroup, Inc v. DatabaseUSA.com LLC et al
Defendant: US Trustee
Appellee: EVEREST GROUP LLC and DatabaseUSA.com LLC
Appellant: INFOGROUP, INC and Infogroup, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01925
Filed: October 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Expedite and #14 Ex Parte Motion to allow late filed opposition. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 10, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #15 Reply by Appellee DatabaseUSA.com LLC. (Pilatowicz, Teresa)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #9 Motion to Expedite by Appellee DatabaseUSA.com LLC. (Pilatowicz, Teresa)
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 EX PARTE MOTION to allow late filed opposition re #13 Response to #9 Motion to Expedite by Appellant Infogroup, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 12/10/2020 to link to motion (MMM).
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #9 Motion to Expedite by Appellant Infogroup, Inc.. Replies due by 12/17/2020. (Johnson, Matthew)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Motion to Expedite. This court finds good cause for additional briefing. In light of the time-sensitive nature of this question, appellant is ordered to respond within five (5) days of this order. Appellees shall have two (2) days to reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #10 Joinder by Appellee Everest Group LLC. (Andersen, Ryan)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER to #9 Motion to Expedite by Appellee Everest Group LLC. (Andersen, Ryan)
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Appeal by Appellee DatabaseUSA.com LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fred Vakili in Support of Debtors Motion to Expedite Appeal) (Pilatowicz, Teresa)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #5 appellant's motion to accept documents under seal be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #7 plaintiff Leland Osborne's motion to extend time to file opening brief be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to File Opening Brief re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by Appellant INFOGROUP, INC. (Johnson, Matthew)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT [Appeal Status Report] by Appellant INFOGROUP, INC. (Johnson, Matthew)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Accept Documents Under Seal Into Appellate Record by Appellant INFOGROUP, INC. Responses due by 11/20/2020. (Johnson, Matthew)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Readiness by INFOGROUP, INC. (JQC)
November 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Readiness by INFOGROUP, INC. (JQC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2020: #1 Appellant Designation of Record and Statment of Issues, #2 Appellant Amended Desig of Record and Statement of Issues, #3 Appellee Supplemental Designation of Record) (AF).
October 16, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/16/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 16, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number BK1910001btb. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Transmittal, #3 Transmittal) (JQC)
October 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Infogroup, Inc v. DatabaseUSA.com LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EVEREST GROUP LLC
Represented By: T. Randall Wright
Represented By: Ryan A Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DatabaseUSA.com LLC
Represented By: Teresa M Pilatowicz
Represented By: Talitha Gray Kozlowski
Represented By: Heather Anson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: INFOGROUP, INC
Represented By: Donald L. Swanson
Represented By: Matthew L. Johnson
Represented By: Russell G Gubler
Represented By: Ashveen Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Infogroup, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Swanson
Represented By: Matthew L. Johnson
Represented By: Russell G Gubler
Represented By: Ashveen Singh Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?