Gorman v. Rheem Manufacturing Company et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gorman
Defendant: Glen Plantone, Vegas Investment Properties, Nevada Sandcastles, LLC, RHEEM SALES COMPANY, INC., RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY, Realty Group, LLC, Midwest Can Company, LLC, Vegas Investment Properties Realty Group LLC and Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01938
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 34 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Laurence Leavitt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Howard J. Russell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6296389) by Defendant Midwest Can Company, LLC. (Russell, Howard)
December 15, 2020 Filing 33 NON-OPPOSITION to #27 Motion, by Defendant Nevada Sandcastles, LLC. (Jaffe, Steven)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David I. Matthews for Midwest Can Company, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 11, 2020 Filing 31 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David I. Matthews and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Howard J. Russell (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6289291) by Defendant Midwest Can Company, LLC. (Russell, Howard)
November 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #28 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 8/20/2021. Motions due by 9/20/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 25, 2020 Filing 28 First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Nicholas Gorman. (Ellis, Adam)
November 23, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION of Defendants Nevada Sandcastles, LLC, Glenn Plantone & Vegas Investment Properties Realty Group, LLC's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement by Defendant Nevada Sandcastles, LLC. Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel in Support of Defendants Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) (Jaffe, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Filing 26 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Rheem Manufacturing Company, Rheem Sales Company, Inc.. (Olson, David)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Stipulation to Extend Opposition Deadline Re: #15 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #23 Stipulation. ERROR: Missing signature dates on page 2. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #23 . (no image attached) (EDS)
November 13, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Opposition Deadline for #15 Motion to Dismiss and [Proposed Order] by Plaintiff Nicholas Gorman. (Ellis, Adam) Modified to link to underlying motion on 11/13/2020 (EDS).
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for David Olson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/9/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) Modified on 11/12/2020 (EDS).
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Kelsey Eagan and approving Designation of Local Counsel Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/6/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) Modified on 11/12/2020 (EDS).
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company.(Thompson, Jeremy) Modified on 11/6/2020 (EDS).
November 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #14 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Thompson, Jeremy)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/3/2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #13 and #14 are DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners Kelsey A. Eagan and David Arthur Olson shall include the printed parties name, signature AND title of the party(ies) appointing Designated Resident Nevada Counsel in this case (not the attorney), in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 5, Lines 5-15 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petitions, and Petitioners will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
October 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Glen Plantone, Nevada Sandcastles, LLC, Vegas Investment Properties Realty Group LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jaffe, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Glen Plantone, Nevada Sandcastles, LLC, Vegas Investment Properties Realty Group LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/14/2020. (Jaffe, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 30, 2020 Filing 14 View Corrected Image #18 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Arthur Olson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeremy J. Thompson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6237201) by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified on 11/6/2020 (EDS).
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 View Corrected Image #19 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kelsey A. Eagan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jeremy J. Thompson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6237180) by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thompson, Jeremy) Modified on 11/6/2020 (EDS).
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc..(Busby, Jerry)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Midwest Can Company, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Saldanha, Ryan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Midwest Can Company, LLC.(Saldanha, Ryan)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/4/2020.(Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Thompson, Jeremy)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Stephen Jack Mendenhall is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David A. Olson and Kelsey A. Eagan to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/3/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/20/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/4/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-821806-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6218758) by RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit Corp Disclosure) (Thompson, Jeremy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. Rheem Manufacturing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Plantone
Represented By: Taylor Robert Anderson
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas Investment Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Sandcastles, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Robert Anderson
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHEEM SALES COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Kelsey A Eagan
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Represented By: David Arthur Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Represented By: Jeremy J. Thompson
Represented By: Kelsey A Eagan
Represented By: David Arthur Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realty Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Can Company, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Sylvester Saldanha
Represented By: Howard J. Russell
Represented By: David I. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vegas Investment Properties Realty Group LLC
Represented By: Taylor Robert Anderson
Represented By: Steven T. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith's Food and Drug Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Jerry S. Busby
Represented By: Gregory A Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Gorman
Represented By: Rahul Ravipudi
Represented By: Mark G Henness
Represented By: Stephen Mendenhall
Represented By: Adam Ellis
Represented By: Ian P Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?