Schoenwald et al v. Unum Group et al
Plaintiff: Heather Schoenwald and Tom Koch
Defendant: Unum Group, Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company and Scott Webb
Case Number: 2:2020cv01948
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company and Unum Group answer due 12/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Salmonson, Dana)
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Scott Webb by Defendant Scott Webb. (McNutt, Daniel)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Scott Webb. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/2/2021.(McNutt, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach.It is the responsibility of the parties to set-up and coordinate the video conference for the ENE. Each party may choose to use any video conference software/app to conduct the ENE. The court will conduct simultaneous video conferences with each party during the ENE and will need a separate video conference link from each party.Each party must then send an invitation link for the ENE to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov by January 6, 2021. Each party must contact chambers (702-464-5540) by January 6, 2021 and be prepared to do a test run of the video conference with chambers on January 7, 2021.A request for an exception to the attendance requirements must be submitted to the undersigned for approval at least two weeks prior to the ENE session. The written evaluation statements must be delivered to chamber or (if statements and exhibits are over 100 pages, please send in multiple e-mails.) emailed to VCF_Chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov, not later than 4:00 p.m., January 6, 2021. DO NOT FILE. DO NOT MAIL THEM TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE. DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmonson, Dana)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company and Unum Group answer due 12/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Defendants Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group. (Salmonson, Dana) Modified on 11/13/2020 (EDS).
November 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tom Koch re #1 Complaint,,. Scott Webb served on 10/28/2020. (Cameron, Daven)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Schoenwald, Tom Koch re #1 Complaint,,. Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company served on 10/26/2020. (Lagomarsino, Andre)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tom Koch, Heather Schoenwald. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lagomarsino, Andre)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6221846) by Heather Schoenwald, Tom Koch. Proof of service due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Lagomarsino, Andre) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
October 21, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoenwald et al v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Schoenwald
Represented By: Sean K Claggett
Represented By: Joseph Nathan Mott
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Koch
Represented By: Andre M. Lagomarsino
Represented By: Daven P. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Webb
Represented By: Matthew C Wolf
Represented By: Daniel R McNutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?