Hartman v. Rivas et al
Plaintiff: Edythe Maxine Hartman
Defendant: ADT LLC doing business as ADT, Juan Rivas, Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. doing business as Interlogix
Case Number: 2:2020cv01968
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Status Report by Defendants ADT LLC, Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC, Juan Rivas. (DeVoy, James)
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants ADT LLC, Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC, Juan Rivas. (DeVoy, James)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc, Other Affiliate Dodge & Cox for Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC added. (DeVoy, James)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for defendants Mr. Rivas, UTC/Interlogix, ADT, and JCSS, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) shall be by or before Thursday, December 17, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 30, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal by Defendants ADT LLC, Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC, Juan Rivas. (DeVoy, James) Modified on 11/1/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 23, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 10/23/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/7/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC: et al that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC: et al added. (DeVoy, James)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ADT LLC of Delaware that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent ADT Inc., Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, LLC for ADT LLC of Delaware added. (DeVoy, James)
October 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from 8th Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-821415-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6226461) by ADT LLC of Delaware, Juan Rivas, Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC: et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Rivas Declaration, #3 Exhibit UTC SOS, #4 Exhibit UTC Consent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (DeVoy, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. Rivas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edythe Maxine Hartman
Represented By: James Urrutia
Represented By: Breanna Hartmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC doing business as ADT
Represented By: Lars K. Evensen
Represented By: James Malcolm DeVoy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Rivas
Represented By: Lars K. Evensen
Represented By: James Malcolm DeVoy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC
Represented By: Lars K. Evensen
Represented By: James Malcolm DeVoy, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. doing business as Interlogix
Represented By: Rebecca L. Mastrangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?