Seelig et al v. Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Stephen M Seelig and Vikki L Seelig
Defendant: Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, First Service Residential NV, Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association, Margaret Denise Gubler, Larry Fresinski, Tommy Uribe, Ricky J McAnally and Marla Howard
Case Number: 2:2020cv01976
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to #21 Supplement to #13 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ricky J McAnally. (Broussard, Carolyn) Modified on 12/21/2020 to reflect correct document link (MMM).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to #11 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Tommy Uribe, Larry Fresinski, Marla Howard and First Service Residential NV.(Cwik, Marc) Modified on 12/15/2020 to reflect additional filing parties. (MMM).
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT to #13 Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Stephen M Seelig, Vikki L Seelig (JQC) Modified on 12/15/2020 to reflect additional filing party and link to underlying motion (MMM).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 12/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Carolyn M. Broussard in for Attorney Rachel L. Wise by Defendant Ricky J McAnally. (Broussard, Carolyn)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 . Pleading was not filed pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b) and LR IC 2-2. Attorney Carolyn Broussard is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the appropriate Motion or Stipulation event. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ricky J McAnally, Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Broussard, Carolyn)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Ricky J McAnally. (Broussard, Carolyn)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ERROR: Wrong event used by attorney; pleading does not comply with local rules. NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Carolyn M. Broussard on behalf of Defendant Ricky J McAnally. Substitution of Attorneys (Broussard, Carolyn) Document #15 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 12/8/2020 (MMM).
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Stephen M Seelig, Vikki L Seelig. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (JQC)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Stephen M Seelig, Vikki L Seelig. Replies due by 12/8/2020. (JQC)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/24/2020. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #6 Motion to Dismiss,. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by First Service Residential NV, Larry Fresinski, Margaret Denise Gubler, Marla Howard, Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Tommy Uribe. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cwik, Marc) Modified on 12/8/2020 to reflect correct filing parties (MMM).
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by First Service Residential NV, Larry Fresinski, Marla Howard, Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Tommy Uribe.(Cwik, Marc)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association.(Broussard, Carolyn)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ricky J McAnally. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wise, Rachel)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Ricky J McAnally. Responses due by 12/7/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/7/2021. (Wise, Rachel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 COMPLAINT against First Service Residential NV, Larry Fresinski, Margaret Denise Gubler, Marla Howard, Ricky J McAnally, Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association, Tommy Uribe (Filing fee $400) by Vikki L Seelig, Stephen M Seelig. Proof of service due by 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (MMM)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Larry Fresinski, Margaret Denise Gubler, Marla Howard, Ricky J McAnally, Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association, Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association, Tommy Uribe. (JQC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/29/2020) (JQC).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 400, receipt number NVLAS072519. (JQC)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty (30) court days from the date of this Order, (1) each Plaintiff shall file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form, in compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) and LSR 1-1; or (2) the Plaintiffs shall collectively pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: ifp/instructions sent to P - JQC)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (JQC)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seelig et al v. Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Vegas Manor and Estates Homeowners Association
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Represented By: Carolyn M. Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Service Residential NV
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Vegas Ranch Landscape Maintenance Association
Represented By: Carolyn M. Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Denise Gubler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Fresinski
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Uribe
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky J McAnally
Represented By: Rachel L. Wise
Represented By: Carolyn M. Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marla Howard
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikki L Seelig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?