Tsatas et al v. Airborne Wireless Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Connie Tsoutsouras, Paul Sublett, Esther Georgakopoulos, Jimmy Asmaklis, Denis Kopitas, Hani Hamam, Kiriakos Primbas, Giovanni Moncada, Andrew Sublett, Jacquez Elbaz, Raymond Baraz, Jaradeh Salim, Terry Tsatas, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Evanthia Primbas, Sofia Kardaras, Maria Tsatas, Jennifer Mills, Evagelia Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, David Chin, Philippe Legault, Panagiota Tsatas, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Patrick Ayoub, James P Carroll, Ernest Leboeuf, George Tsatas, Martine Benezra, Corradino Galuppo, Fotini Venetis, Manolis Kostakis, Michael Bescec, Pascal Abdallah, Ourania Tsatas, Marc Riel, Bessie Peppas, Eftihios Litsakis, Raymonde Kanha, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Constantin Zissis and Alfred Bekhit
Defendant: Apcentive, Inc., Airborne Wireless Network, Inc., Marius De Mos, Kelly Kabilafkas, Robert Bruce Harris, Jason De Mos, J. Edward Daniels and Michael J. Warren
Case Number: 2:2020cv02045
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Entered in error by Clerk's Office. Document terminated. NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #29 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Defendants answer due 1/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Patrick M. Maloney and Gregory M. Smith to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/6/2021. (no image attached) (SLD)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) RE DEFENDANTS' RESPONSES re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Goodman, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills re #1 Complaint,,,. Robert Bruce Harris served on 12/2/2020. (Goodman, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills re #1 Complaint,,,. Kelly Kabilafkas served on 12/9/2020. (Goodman, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills re #1 Complaint,,,. J. Edward Daniels served on 12/3/2020. (Goodman, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills re #1 Complaint,,,. Apcentive, Inc. served on 12/9/2020. (Goodman, Andrew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills re #1 Complaint,,,. Airborne Wireless Network, Inc. served on 12/1/2020. (Goodman, Andrew)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission for Farhad Novian to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission for Andrew B. Goodman to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission for Alexander B. Gura to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael C. Van. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Airborne Wireless Network, Inc., J. Edward Daniels, Jason De Mos, Marius De Mos, Robert Bruce Harris, Kelly Kabilafkas, Michael J. Warren re #1 Complaint. (MR)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to AIRBORNE WIRELESS NETWORK, INC. by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Apcentive, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to APCENTIVE, INC. by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required to ECF Nos. #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , and #15 . Incorrect form used by attorney. The Court will only issue summons submitted on the approved form available on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.govAttorney Michael Van advised to go to the Court's website and download the form "AO 440 (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action". The completed forms for all named defendants should be filed together, using the event "proposed summons to be issued".Documents #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , and #15 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (MMM)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to ROBERT B. HARRIS by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #15 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to J. EDWARD DANIELS by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #14 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to MICHAEL J. WARREN by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #13 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to MARIUS DE MOS by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #12 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to JASON DE MOS by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #11 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to KELLY KABILAFKAS by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #10 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to AIRBORNE WIRELESS NETWORK, INC. by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #9 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ERROR: Incorrect form submitted by attorney. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to APCENTIVE, INC. by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael) Document #8 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/20/2020 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Farhad Novian and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6264853) by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew B. Goodman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6264845) by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Brendon Gura and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael C. Van (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6264799) by Plaintiffs Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. (Van, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pascal Abdallah, Jimmy Asmaklis, Patrick Ayoub, Raymond Baraz, Alfred Bekhit, Martine Benezra, Michael Bescec, James P Carroll, David Chin, Jacquez Elbaz, Corradino Galuppo, Esther Georgakopoulos, Hani Hamam, Raymonde Kanha, Sofia Kardaras, Denis Kopitas, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Ernest Leboeuf, Philippe Legault, Eftihios Litsakis, Jennifer Mills, Giovanni Moncada, Niki Paliovrakas, Denis Parsons, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Kiriakos Primbas, Marc Riel, Jaradeh Salim, Andrew Sublett, Paul Sublett, George Tsatas, Maria Tsatas, Ourania Tsatas, Panagiota Tsatas, Terry Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Leonidas Valkanas, Fotini Venetis, Constantin Zissis. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Van, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Farhad Novian, Andrew B. Goodman and Alexander B. Gura to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/20/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400) by Niki Paliovrakas, Jimmy Asmaklis, Hani Hamam, Corradino Galuppo, Raymond Baraz, Maria Tsatas, Kiriakos Primbas, Fotini Venetis, Ernest Leboeuf, Panagiota Tsatas, Esther Georgakopoulos, Raymonde Kanha, Alfred Bekhit, David Chin, Denis Parsons, Jaradeh Salim, Marc Riel, Giovanni Moncada, Philippe Legault, Andrew Sublett, Pascal Abdallah, Jacquez Elbaz, Bessie Peppas, Evanthia Primbas, Constantin Zissis, George Tsatas, Connie Tsoutsouras, Eftihios Litsakis, Paul Sublett, Jimmy Tsoutsouras, Ourania Tsatas, Sofia Kardaras, Michael Bescec, Patrick Ayoub, Evagelia Kostakis, Manolis Kostakis, Leonidas Valkanas, Martine Benezra, Denis Kopitas, James P Carroll, Nicholas Tsoutsouras, Terry Tsatas, Jennifer Mills. Proof of service due by 2/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (MR)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsatas et al v. Airborne Wireless Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Tsoutsouras
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sublett
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Georgakopoulos
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Asmaklis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Kopitas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hani Hamam
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiriakos Primbas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanni Moncada
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Sublett
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquez Elbaz
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Baraz
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaradeh Salim
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Tsatas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niki Paliovrakas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denis Parsons
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanthia Primbas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sofia Kardaras
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Tsatas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Mills
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evagelia Kostakis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonidas Valkanas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Chin
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philippe Legault
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panagiota Tsatas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Tsoutsouras
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ayoub
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Carroll
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Leboeuf
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Tsatas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martine Benezra
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corradino Galuppo
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fotini Venetis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manolis Kostakis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bescec
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascal Abdallah
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ourania Tsatas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Riel
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Peppas
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eftihios Litsakis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymonde Kanha
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Tsoutsouras
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constantin Zissis
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Bekhit
Represented By: Garrett Royal Chase
Represented By: Michael C Van
Represented By: Andrew Blane Goodman
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Alexander B. Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apcentive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airborne Wireless Network, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Smith
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Represented By: Patrick M. Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marius De Mos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Kabilafkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bruce Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason De Mos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Edward Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?