Al-Okaibi et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Aiman Al-Okaibi and Louay Al-Okaibi
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Christopher A. Wray, Chad Wolf, Los Angeles Asylum Office, Matthew Emrich, Ken Cuccinelli, David Radel, Marianne Hong and Jennifer Higgins
Case Number: 2:2020cv02057
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation; Answer due 2/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 15, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Matthew Emrich, Jennifer Higgins, Marianne Hong, Los Angeles Asylum Office, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray. (Rose, Patrick)
December 3, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Christopher A. Wray served on 11/13/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. David Radel served on 11/12/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Department of Homeland Security served on 11/12/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/12/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 11/12/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Matthew Emrich served on 11/16/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Jennifer Higgins served on 11/16/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Chad Wolf served on 11/16/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Marianne Hong served on 11/16/2020. (Terry, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Ken Cuccinelli served on 11/16/2020. (Terry, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi, Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Terry, Michael)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2. Counsel is advised to correct the discrepancy and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #2 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 VIEW #5 corrected image re CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi, Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Terry, Michael) Modified on 11/9/2020 (DKJ).
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Cuccinelli, Matthew Emrich, Jennifer Higgins, Marianne Hong, Los Angeles Asylum Office, David Radel, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad Wolf, Christopher A. Wray (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6246901) by Aiman Al-Okaibi, Ebrahim Al-Okaibi, Louay Al-Okaibi, Wafa Al-Okaibi, Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi. Proof of service due by 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons DHS, #3 Summons USCIS, #4 Summons LA Asylum Office, #5 Summons Radel, #6 Summons Hong, #7 Summons Wolf, #8 Summons Cuccinelli, #9 Summons Higgins, #10 Summons Emrich, #11 Summons Wray) (Terry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 6, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Okaibi et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Asylum Office
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Emrich
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Radel
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Hong
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Higgins
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wafa Al-Okaibi
Represented By: Michael S Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdulraheem Khalil Al-Okaibi
Represented By: Michael S Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebrahim Al-Okaibi
Represented By: Michael S Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aiman Al-Okaibi
Represented By: Michael S Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louay Al-Okaibi
Represented By: Michael S Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?