Aceto v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Carl Aceto
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv02102
Filed: November 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel P. Talbert on behalf of Defendant Commissioner Of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (JM)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Commissioner Of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM)
November 14, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
November 14, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Carl Aceto. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Taylor, Hal)
November 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Of Social Security (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6255511) by Michael Carl Aceto. Proof of service due by 2/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons OCG, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons USAO) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 11/16/2020 (JM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aceto v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel P. Talbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Carl Aceto
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?