Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Aurelia Skipwith, Glen Knowles, William Dunkelberger and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 2:2020cv02131
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Bridget Kennedy McNeil by Defendants David Bernhardt, William Dunkelberger, Glen Knowles, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Mcneil, Bridget)
January 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Mixson. Plaintiffs' Notice of Change of Address (Mixson, Christopher)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Admit Government Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/7/2021) (JQC).
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Taylor A. Mayhall by Defendants David Bernhardt, William Dunkelberger, Glen Knowles, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Mayhall, Taylor)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Admit Government Attorney Paul G. Freeborne by Defendants David Bernhardt, William Dunkelberger, Glen Knowles, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service. (Freeborne, Paul)
December 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher W. Mixson. (Mixson, Christopher)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Ryan Shannon and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/2/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Nicholas A. Trutanich, U.S. Attorney. (JQC)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Adair Shannon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6268283) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendants re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ryan Shannon to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/3/2020. (no image attached) (JQC)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Center for Biological Diversity. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mixson, Christopher)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, William Dunkelberger, Glen Knowles, Aurelia Skipwith, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Forest Service (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6263147) by Center for Biological Diversity. Proof of service due by 2/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Bernhardt, #3 Summons William Dunkelberger, #4 Summons U.S. Forest Service, #5 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #6 Summons Glen Knowles, #7 Summons Aurelia Skipwith, #8 Summons Nicholas A. Trutanich) (Mixson, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 19, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipwith
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Knowles
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dunkelberger
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Paul Gerald Freeborne
Represented By: Taylor Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Bridget Mcneil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Ryan Shannon
Represented By: Christopher W. Mixson
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Represented By: Christopher Mixson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?