Caudill v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darren D. Caudill
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv02148
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sarah Wyeth McAdam on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (McAdam, Sarah)
December 18, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT received re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued - US Attorney General (7018 3090 0001 1133 4072). (HAM)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT received re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued - Social Security Administration (7018 3090 0001 1133 4089). (HAM)
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued, #5 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 12/7/2020. (HAM)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re #5 Complaint, #6 Summons Issued - Social Security Administration (7018 3090 0001 1133 4089) and US Attorney General (7018 3090 0001 1133 4072). (HAM)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (HAM)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Darren D. Caudill. Proof of service due by 3/1/2021. (HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file the Complaint (ECF No. #1 -1) and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint (ECF NO. #1 -1) by certified mail to: (1) the Attorney General of the United States, Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W., Room 4400, Washington, D.C. 20530; and (3) Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IX, Social Security Administration, 160 Spear St., Suite 899, San Francisco, CA 94105-1545. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint (ECF NO. #1 -1) to the U.S. Marshal for service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that from this point forward, Plaintiff must serve upon defendant, or his attorney if he has retained one, a copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted for consideration by the court. Plaintiff must include with the original paper submitted for filing a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of the document was mailed to the defendants or their counsel. The court may disregard any paper received by a district judge, magistrate judge, or the Clerk which fails to include a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (EDS)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Darren D. Caudill. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Darren D. Caudill. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Safa, Cyrus)
November 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caudill v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Sarah Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren D. Caudill
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?