Flowers v. Discover Bank
Plaintiff: Donna M Flowers
Defendant: Discover Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv02152
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation; Discover Bank answer due 1/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Discover Bank. (Kim, Emil)
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna M Flowers re #6 Summons Issued. Discover Bank served on 12/11/2020. (Gliner, Mitchell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Discover Bank. (JM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donna M Flowers. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 . Document #2 is not signed and does not contain the case number. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiencies and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #2 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Donna M Flowers. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Discover Bank (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6266586) by Donna M Flowers. Proof of service due by 2/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gliner, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna M Flowers
Represented By: Mitchell D Gliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Emil Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?