Traeger Pellet Grills LLC v. GMG Products LLC
Plaintiff: Traeger Pellet Grills LLC
Defendant: GMG Products LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02161
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
2 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/12/2021. Defendant's unopposed motion to stay the case pending disposition of the International Trade Commission proceedings (ECF No. #26 ) is granted. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within 7 days from such disposition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 11, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant GMG Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hendricks, Jean Paul)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER approving ECF No. #24 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David A. Lowe for GMG Products LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Jean Paul Hendricks. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David A. Lowe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jean Paul Hendricks (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6305239) by Defendant GMG Products LLC. (Hendricks, Jean Paul)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting ECF No. #22 Stipulation : GMG Products LLC answer to complaint due by Thursday, 2/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 17, 2020 Filing 22 STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME FOR GMG PRODUCTS LLC TO FILE A RESPONSE TO TRAEGER PELLET GRILLS LLCS COMPLAINT [ECF NO. 1] re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant GMG Products LLC. (Hendricks, Jean Paul)
December 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Lowe to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/29/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 15, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jean Paul Hendricks on behalf of Defendant GMG Products LLC. (Hendricks, Jean Paul)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. (Lower, Ryan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #17 Declaration : Ryan Lower QC made necessary correction to the program to reflect Defendant was served on 11/30/2020. Filer is advised to call the clerk office if he does not know which event to use. Under commencement of action is the summons returned executed which is the correct event to use. This allows the program to properlykeep track of entities that have been served. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Service re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued by Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Lower, Ryan)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving ECF No. #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael P. Chu on behalf of Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Ryan M. Lower. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER approving ECF No. #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian A. Jones on behalf of Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Ryan M. Lower. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/1/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael P. Chu and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ryan M. Lower (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6274633) by Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Lower, Ryan)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian A. Jones and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Ryan M. Lower (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6274618) by Plaintiff Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Lower, Ryan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-02161-MMD-DJA. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/25/2020. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (DKJ).
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #8 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Ryan M Lower advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Corporate Parent Traeger Pellet Grills Intermediate Holdings, LLC added. (Lower, Ryan) Modified on 11/25/2020 to add corporate parent (DKJ).
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Attorney Ryan Lower is advised to refile ECF No. #2 using the appropriate docket entry event "Certificate of Interested Parties". (no image attached) (MMM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Michael P. Chu and Brian A. Jones to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/8/2020. (no image attached) (HAM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (HAM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GMG Products LLC. (HAM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 ERROR: Wrong event selected by filing party. NOTICE Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and LR 7.1-1 by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. (Lower, Ryan) Document #2 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 11/24/2020 (MMM).
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Traeger Pellet Grills LLC GMG Products LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6268615) by Traeger Pellet Grills LLC. Proof of service due by 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons) (Lower, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 11/25/2020 (DKJ).
November 24, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. Nature of Suit: 830/835 Patent Case (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traeger Pellet Grills LLC v. GMG Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traeger Pellet Grills LLC
Represented By: Ryan M. Lower
Represented By: Brian Jones
Represented By: Michael P. Chu
Represented By: Brian A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMG Products LLC
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Represented By: Jean Paul Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?