Muyderman v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Muyderman
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02172
Filed: November 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia L. Muyderman. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. served on 1/6/2021. (Hernandez, Kevin)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cynthia L. Muyderman. Trans Union LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2020, answer due 2/1/2021. (Hernandez, Kevin)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 27, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia L. Muyderman. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hernandez, Kevin)
November 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6271200) by Cynthia L. Muyderman. Proof of service due by 2/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons General Motors Financial Company, Inc., #3 Summons Trans Union LLC) (Hernandez, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muyderman v. General Motors Financial Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Financial Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Rebecca Bergh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Muyderman
Represented By: Kevin L. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?