Brooks v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kirk Brooks
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02173
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kirk Brooks. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Marcek, Cliff)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kirk Brooks. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Marcek, Cliff)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Madison Tate Donaldson Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/10/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (HAM)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Madison Tate Donaldson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Cliff W. Marcek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6281599) by Plaintiff Kirk Brooks. (Marcek, Cliff)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Kirk Brooks. (Marcek, Cliff)
November 30, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6271792) by Kirk Brooks. Proof of service due by 2/28/2021. (Marcek, Cliff) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Brooks
Represented By: Cliff W. Marcek
Represented By: Madison Tate Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?