My Daily Choice, Inc. v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: My Daily Choice, Inc.
Defendant: Kristen Butler, William T. Butler and Arieyl, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02178
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #1 Complaint. Arieyl, LLC answer due 2/10/2021; Kristen Butler answer due 2/10/2021; William T. Butler answer due 2/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Arieyl, LLC, Kristen Butler, William T. Butler. (Green, Ronald)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Re: #18 Status Report. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must file, no later than January 29, 2021, a stipulation to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Arieyl, LLC, Kristen Butler, William T. Butler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald D. Green) (Green, Ronald)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that by no later than February 2, 2021, Defendants must file a response to the complaint, a request to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint, or a status report explaining why a response is not currently overdue at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 7/5/2021. Motions due by 8/4/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. (Sechrist, Jared)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marc Randazza and Ronald D. Green on behalf of Defendants Arieyl, LLC, Kristen Butler, William T. Butler. (Randazza, Marc) Modified on 1/5/2021 (EDS).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Daily Choice, Inc.. Arieyl, LLC served on 12/19/2020. (Turner, Erika)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Daily Choice, Inc.. Kristen Butler served on 12/19/2020. (Turner, Erika)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by My Daily Choice, Inc.. William T. Butler served on 12/19/2020. (Turner, Erika)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Ross Campbell Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 David Peck Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ross Campbell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jared Sechrist (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6292052) by Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. (Sechrist, Jared)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Peck and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jared Sechrist (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6292048) by Plaintiff My Daily Choice, Inc.. (Sechrist, Jared)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David Peck and Ross Campbell to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/14/2020. (no image attached) (HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (mailed with copy of complaint - HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (HAM)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by My Daily Choice, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Turner, Erika)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6272122) by My Daily Choice, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - William T. Butler, #3 Summons Summons - Kristen Butler, #4 Summons Summons - Arieyl LLC) (Turner, Erika) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My Daily Choice, Inc. v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Butler
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Butler
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arieyl, LLC
Represented By: Ronald D Green, Jr
Represented By: Marc Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My Daily Choice, Inc.
Represented By: Jared Sechrist
Represented By: David Peck
Represented By: Ross Campbell
Represented By: Erika Pike Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?