Reuter et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Dawson Reuter and Dulce Victoria Galindo Felix
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo, Chad F Wolf, Eric S. Cohan and William P Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv02180
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall refile a petition on the form furnished by the clerk in compliance with LR IA 11-2(a) within 14 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dulce Victoria Galindo Felix, Thomas Dawson Reuter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hill, Lawrence)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #3 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 11-2(a), which states in part that the application must be on the form furnished by the clerk. The form can be found at: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. LR IA 11-2(a) Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #3 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Felipe D.J. Millan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Sean P. O'Callaghan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6276751) by Plaintiffs Dulce Victoria Galindo Felix, Thomas Dawson Reuter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Hill, Lawrence)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
November 30, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William P Barr, Eric S. Cohan, Michael R. Pompeo, Chad F Wolf (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6272567) by Thomas Dawson Reuter, Dulce Victoria Galindo Felix. Proof of service due by 2/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons to Michael R. Pompeo, #3 Summons Summons to Eric S. Cohan, #4 Summons Summons to Chad F. Wolf, #5 Summons Summons to William P. Barr) (Hill, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reuter et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dawson Reuter
Represented By: Sean Paul O'Callaghan
Represented By: Lawrence C Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dulce Victoria Galindo Felix
Represented By: Sean Paul O'Callaghan
Represented By: Lawrence C Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric S. Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?