Staria v. Corelogic Teletrack
Plaintiff: Sailija Staria
Defendant: Corelogic Teletrack
Case Number: 2:2020cv02241
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Corelogic Teletrack that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CoreLogic, Inc., Corporate Parent CoreLogic Information Resources LLC for Corelogic Teletrack added. (Jacobsen, Laura)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Defendant Corelogic Teletrack. Responses due by 2/16/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/19/2021. (Jacobsen, Laura) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Corelogic Teletrack answer due 2/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) and [Proposed] Order re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Corelogic Teletrack. (Jacobsen, Laura)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sailija Staria re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued. Corelogic Teletrack served on 12/15/2020. (Krieger, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Corelogic Teletrack re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
December 11, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sailija Staria. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Krieger, David)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6289062) by Sailija Staria. Proof of service due by 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Corelogic) (Krieger, David) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staria v. Corelogic Teletrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Teletrack
Represented By: Laura R. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sailija Staria
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Represented By: Shawn Wayne Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?