Boyer v. Williams
Plaintiff: Donald Boyer
Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02249
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Construing #4 Request for Judicial notice as motion for voluntary dismissal and the Court grants the motion. This matter is Dismissed. Clerk shall supply a copy of the motion for preliminary injunction at [1-1] (attached herein for disbursement through law library). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Judicial Notice, by Plaintiff Donald Boyer. (DRM)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a complaint, a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis with all three documents as stated in the order or pay the full $402 filing fee in full on or before 2/16/2021. The Clerk is directed to supply the Plaintiff with proper 42:1983 forms and instructions, the approved application and instructions for in forma pauperis status and a copy of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (attached for dissemination through law library). See order for additional detail and instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 42 USC 1983 Complaint form and instructions, #2 Application and Instructions for IFP status, #3 Courtesy copy of Plaintiff's P.I. motion)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 15, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (DRS)
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LW)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction) (LW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Boyer
Represented By: HDSP Law Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?