Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. Madsen Holdings, LLC d/b/a Madsen Marketing & PR et al
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Defendant: Infiniti and Beyond, LLC d/b/a Infiniti of Northern Kentucky, Madsen Holdings, LLC d/b/a Madsen Marketing & PR, Tiger Motors LV, Inc. d/b/a Infiniti of Las Vegas, Madsen Holdings, LLC doing business as Madsen Marketing & PR, Infiniti and Beyond, LLC doing business as Infiniti of Northern Kentucky, Brittany Madsen and Tiger Motors LV, Inc. doing business as Infiniti of Las Vegas
Counter Claimant: Madsen Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00026
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Madsen Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fountain, Jonathan)
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America by Brittany Madsen, Madsen Holdings, LLC. filed by Brittany Madsen, Madsen Holdings, LLC.(Fountain, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/6/2021 (MMM).
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Brittany Madsen and Madsen Holdings, LLC answer due 3/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America re #8 Summons Issued, #5 Notice of Corrected Image/Document. Brittany Madsen served on 2/7/2021. (Boyle, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 14 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Madsen Holdings, LLC on 2/10/2021 executed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America re #8 Summons Issued, #5 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #1 Complaint,,,. Acceptance of Service of Summons and Complaint on Behalf of Defendant Madsen Holdings, LLC (Boyle, James)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #12 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendants Brittany Madsen, Madsen Holdings, LLC. (Fountain, Jonathan) Modified on 2/10/2021 to add document link (MMM).
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Tiger Motors LV, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/22/2021.(Foley, Erik) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America re #8 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,,. Tiger Motors LV, Inc. served on 1/15/2021. (Boyle, James)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America re #8 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,,. Infiniti and Beyond, LLC served on 1/13/2021. (Boyle, James)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Infiniti and Beyond, LLC, Brittany Madsen, Madsen Holdings, LLC, Tiger Motors LV, Inc.. (JQC) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/7/2021) (JQC).
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JQC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2021: #1 Complaint) (cc: U.S. Copyright Office - JQC). Modified on 1/8/2021 - Distribution (JQC).
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Brittany Madsen by Plaintiff Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Boyle, James)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Boyle, James)
January 7, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Parties listed in the caption of the complaint do not match the parties listed in the body of the complaint. Attorney James Boyle is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #1 . Do NOT link to this Notice. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boyle, James)
January 7, 2021 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 VIEW #5 corrected image to COMPLAINT against Infiniti and Beyond, LLC d/b/a Infiniti of Northern Kentucky, Madsen Holdings, LLC d/b/a Madsen Marketing & PR, Tiger Motors LV, Inc. d/b/a Infiniti of Las Vegas (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6318823) by Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America. Proof of service due by 4/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Madsen Holdings LLC, #11 Summons Infiniti and Beyond LLC, #12 Summons Tiger Motors LV, Inc.) (Boyle, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 1/7/2021 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America v. Madsen Holdings, LLC d/b/a Madsen Marketing & PR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infiniti and Beyond, LLC d/b/a Infiniti of Northern Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madsen Holdings, LLC d/b/a Madsen Marketing & PR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Motors LV, Inc. d/b/a Infiniti of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madsen Holdings, LLC doing business as Madsen Marketing & PR
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Steven Edman Kish, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infiniti and Beyond, LLC doing business as Infiniti of Northern Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Madsen
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Steven Edman Kish, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiger Motors LV, Inc. doing business as Infiniti of Las Vegas
Represented By: Erik Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanta-Star Automotive Research Corporation of America
Represented By: James D. Boyle
Represented By: Stephen M. Dorvee
Represented By: Morgan E.M. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Madsen Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Steven Edman Kish, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?