Cohen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Robyn Alise Cohen
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL Returned 7018 3090 0001 1133 4805. (JQC)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL returned 7018 3090 0001 1133 4799. (JQC)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. Andrew Saul served on 1/12/2021. (JQC)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: AG of the United States, SSA, NV AG along w/complaint - JQC)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Robyn Alise Cohen. Proof of service due by 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JQC)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. See Order for Details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (DKJ)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robyn Alise Cohen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robyn Alise Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons). (Safa, Cyrus)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Alise Cohen
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Morris Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?